Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nestorius Timanywa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1937Born
11 Dec 196629.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
26 Nov 197336.5AppointedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
24 Feb 197436.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
15 Jan 201375.6RetiredBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
28 Aug 201881.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Nestorius Timanywa
Bishop Nestorius Timanywa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bukoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKakungiri
Death PlaceBugando Medical Centre, Mwanza

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2013
  • d: CB, 28 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Nov 2018

Quantcast