Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rulenge-Ngara

Dioecesis Rulengensis-



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Severine Niwemugizi, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukoba
8 April 1929ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tabora
Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukoba (erected)
Diocese of Bukoba
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bukoba Diocese of Bukoba
Diocese of Rulenge
21 June 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Bukoba Diocese of Rulenge
14 August 2008Territory LostDiocese of Rulenge Diocese of Kayanga (erected)
Diocese of Rulenge-Ngara
14 August 2008Name ChangedDiocese of Rulenge Diocese of Rulenge-Ngara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukoba
1950111,581523,90321.3%2545701,594139717ap1951
Diocese of Bukoba
195796,631421,91822.9%1261731,3231110716ap1960
Diocese of Rulenge
1970105,271274,91438.3%1429432,448373814ap1971
1980148,539458,42332.4%2720473,1602713815ap1981
1990192,825559,02534.5%4210523,7082020615ap1991
1999494,884925,20053.5%595647,7321122720ap2000
2000504,500871,43657.9%575628,1371118920ap2001
2001533,006871,43661.2%586648,3281319323ap2002
2002549,783894,96361.4%545599,3181218625ap2003
2003564,378939,83360.1%544589,7301016125ap2004
2004595,7731,171,20950.9%5635910,097914625ap2005
Diocese of Rulenge-Ngara
2008344,054767,35944.8%462487,167416415bul14Aug08
2010168,921835,00020.2%392414,120830315ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013