Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Almachius Vincent Rweyongeza

Bishop of Kayanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1956 BornBushagara-Kamachumu
6 Dec 198125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
14 Aug 200852.6AppointedBishop of Kayanga, Tanzania
6 Nov 200852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kayanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Almachius Vincent Rweyongeza:
Bishop Almachius Vincent Rweyongeza (born ) Bishop of Kayanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kayanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013