Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael George Mabuga Msonganzila

Bishop of Musoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1956 Born
2 Dec 198428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mwanza, Tanzania
10 Nov 200751.3AppointedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
20 Jan 200851.5Ordained BishopBishop of Musoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Michael George Mabuga Msonganzila
Bishop Michael George Mabuga Msonganzila (born ) Bishop of Musoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukumbi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Musoma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,663
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast