Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Mwoleka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rulenge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1927BornItahwa
30 Jun 196234.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 196941.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rulenge, Tanzania
6 Mar 196941.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zica
19 Jun 196941.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zica
26 Jun 196941.9AppointedBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania
8 Nov 199669.2ResignedBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania
16 Oct 200275.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rulenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Christopher Mwoleka:
Bishop Christopher Mwoleka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rulenge

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013