Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damian Kyaruzi

Bishop Emeritus of Sumbawanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1940 Born
29 Jun 196828.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199756.9AppointedBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
29 Jun 199757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
19 Apr 201877.9RetiredBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Damian Kyaruzi
Bishop Damian Kyaruzi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sumbawanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButainamwa
Ordained BishopStade Nelson Mandela, Sumbawanga, Diocese of Sumbawanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sumbawanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,025
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast