Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Huang Chao-ming

Bishop of Hwalien, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1954 Born
12 Apr 198328.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hwalien, Taiwan
27 Jun 199843.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
27 Jun 199843.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamphua
26 Sep 199844.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamphua
19 Nov 200147.2AppointedBishop of Hwalien, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Philip Huang Chao-ming
Bishop Philip Huang Chao-ming (born ) Bishop of Hwalien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuli, Diocese of Hwalien
Ordained BishopKaohsiung, Diocese of Kaohsiung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hwalien.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,436
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast