Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lin Thien-chu

Deceased

Bishop of Kiayi, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1935Born
21 Dec 196126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kiayi, Taiwan
25 Nov 198550.8AppointedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
12 Jan 198651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
4 Mar 199459.1DiedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lin Thien-chu
Bishop Joseph Lin Thien-chu (born , died ) Bishop of Kiayi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePo Kion Lung

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast