Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard Hsu Ying-fa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Taipei

Titular Bishop of Abthugni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1923BornTung A-Shi-Pa-shengchung
29 Mar 195229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Oct 199067.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taipei, Taiwan
6 Oct 199067.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
30 Nov 199067.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abthugni
11 May 200178.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Taipei, Taiwan
2 Mar 200380.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Taipei, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Leonard Hsu Ying-fa:
Bishop Leonard Hsu Ying-fa O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Taipei

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,386
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013