Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pio Cardinal Taofinu’u, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Samoa-Apia, Samoa

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1923BornFalealupo
8 Dec 195431.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
11 Jan 196844.1AppointedBishop of Apia, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
29 May 196844.5Ordained BishopBishop of Apia, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
5 Mar 197349.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197349.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
10 Sep 198258.8AppointedArchbishop of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
10 Sep 198258.8AppointedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
198561.1ResignedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Nov 200278.9RetiredArchbishop of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Jan 200682.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Pio Taofinu’u:
Cardinal Pio Taofinu’u S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Samoa-Apia

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
  • a cardinal for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013