Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Suva

Archidioecesis Suvanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Loy Chong, Archbishop
  • Petero Mataca, Archbishop Emeritus
  • George Hamilton Pearce, S.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Fiji
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 18,333 (7,081 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.relpac.org.fj/suva.htm
  • Mailing Address: Archdiocesan Office, Nicolas House, 25 Pratt St., P.O. Box 109, Suva, Fiji Islands
  • Telephone: 330.19.55
  • Fax: 330.15.65

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fiji Island
27 March 1863ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Fiji Island (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fiji Island
10 May 1887ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fiji Island Vicariate Apostolic of Fiji Island
Archdiocese of Suva
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fiji Island Archdiocese of Suva

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Suva
197046,672526,7658.9%10728256911925035ap1971
198052,644624,0628.4%21608164910624433ap1981
199067,325727,1049.3%189010862315219233ap1991
199984,236841,14210.0%238210580213918234ap2000
200086,141849,63710.1%289212071717115534ap2001
200182,695815,71410.1%299712665617216135ap2002
200284,291824,43810.2%279912666816714335ap2003
200385,518890,3939.6%319212369515115135ap2004
200487,090959,4249.1%3311214560018015935ap2005
2010101,0501,297,6837.8%3049791,27910213535ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 7 Jul 2013