Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lolesio (Laurent) Fuahea

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1927BornHihifo
21 Dec 195730.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Mar 197244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Mar 197244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagai
16 Jul 197244.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagai
25 Apr 197446.6AppointedBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Jun 200577.7RetiredBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Dec 201184.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Lolesio (Laurent) Fuahea:
Bishop Lolesio (Laurent) Fuahea (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 791
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015