Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Hubert Macey Rodgers, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Nigizubi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1915Born
15 Dec 194025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
29 Jun 195337.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Jun 195337.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sbida
11 Feb 195438.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sbida
21 Jun 196650.6AppointedBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Apr 197256.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
1 Mar 197357.3AppointedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Mar 197761.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand
21 Mar 197761.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
7 Aug 198569.8AppointedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Jul 198670.7ResignedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
10 Jan 199781.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for John Hubert Macey Rodgers
Bishop John Hubert Macey Rodgers S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWallaceville

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017