Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia

Archidioecesis Samoa-Apianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alapati Lui Mataeliga, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 26 June 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Samoa
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 2,922 (1,128 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.relpac.org.fj/samoa-apia.htm
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, St. Joseph Building, P.O. Box 532, Apia, Samoa
  • Telephone: 20.400/1
  • Fax: 20.402

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}
20 August 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Isole Samoa e Tokelau
4 January 1957Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori} Vicariate Apostolic of Isole Samoa e Tokelau
Diocese of Apia
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Isole Samoa e Tokelau Diocese of Apia
Diocese of Apia o Samoa and Tokelau
10 August 1974Name ChangedDiocese of Apia Diocese of Apia o Samoa and Tokelau
Diocese of Samoa and Tokelau
3 December 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Apia o Samoa and Tokelau Diocese of Samoa and Tokelau
10 September 1982Territory LostDiocese of Samoa and Tokelau Diocese of Samoa-Pago Pago (erected)
Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia and Tokelau
10 September 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Samoa and Tokelau Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia and Tokelau
Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia
26 June 1992SplitArchdiocese of Samoa-Apia and Tokelau Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tokelau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}
195020,00052025800146914ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Isole Samoa e Tokelau
Diocese of Apia
197036,521173,26421.1%529341,0745710721ap1971
Diocese of Apia o Samoa and Tokelau
Diocese of Samoa and Tokelau
197634,472183,81418.8%1027379316013824ap1977
198036,224188,65119.2%1029399286812124ap1981
Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia and Tokelau
199037,237166,06922.4%1723409304469622ap1991
Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia
199942,117182,22123.1%2517421,00225327628ap2000
200049,199182,22127.0%2417411,199223311738ap2001
200130,336183,00016.6%29215060624467129ap2002
200231,096181,00017.2%27204766124447229ap2003
200342,473182,37923.3%28214986621566329ap2004
200435,452180,40219.7%26224873817356932ap2005
201042,500189,00022.5%35155085030337338ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013