Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Dieter, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa

Titular Bishop of Ierafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1903BornEinhausen, Germany
29 Jun 193329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
16 Nov 195350.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Nov 195350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierafi
19 May 195450.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierafi
28 Jun 195551.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Dieter:
Bishop Jean Baptiste Dieter S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013