Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Patrick Ashby

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1923BornBelfast
1 Jan 195026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
11 Jul 196440.7AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
5 Aug 196440.7Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 Jul 198561.7ResignedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
5 Jun 198864.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Brian Patrick Ashby:
Bishop Brian Patrick Ashby (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013