Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Tanasini

Bishop of Chiavari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1945 Born
1 Mar 196923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
6 Jul 199650.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
6 Jul 199650.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Suelli
14 Sep 199651.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suelli
20 Mar 200458.6AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
16 May 200458.7InstalledBishop of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Tanasini
Bishop Alberto Tanasini (born ) Bishop of Chiavari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiavari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,789
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast