Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Canessa

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1938 BornGenova-Voltri
29 Jun 196223.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 198950.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
20 Jun 198950.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
9 Jul 198951.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
2 Feb 199657.5AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
15 Oct 201476.2RetiredBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Canessa:
Bishop Martino Canessa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tortona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,180
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014