Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Mitsuaki Takami, P.S.S.

Archbishop of Nagasaki


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1946 BornNagasaki
20 Mar 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
29 Oct 197327.6AppointedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
7 Feb 200255.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nagasaki, Japan
7 Feb 200255.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
29 Apr 200256.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
17 Oct 200357.6AppointedArchbishop of Nagasaki, Japan
14 Dec 200357.7InstalledArchbishop of Nagasaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mitsuaki Takami:
Archbishop Joseph Mitsuaki Takami P.S.S. (born ) Archbishop of Nagasaki

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nagasaki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Aug 2014