Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Michiaki Nakamura

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nagasaki, Japan

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1962 Born
19 Mar 198825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
31 May 201957.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nagasaki, Japan
31 May 201957.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
16 Sep 201957.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë

MicroData Summary for Peter Michiaki Nakamura
Father Peter Michiaki Nakamura (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nagasaki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaikai-city, Archdiocese of Nagasaki
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Nagasaki, Archdiocese of Nagasaki

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Nagasaki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Jun 2019

Quantcast