Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Toshihiro Sakai

Auxiliary Bishop of Osaka, Japan

Titular Bishop of Nova Barbara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1960 Born
Feb 198827.8EnteredMember of Opus Dei
20 Aug 198828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
2 Jun 201858.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osaka, Japan
2 Jun 201858.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
16 Jul 201858.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara

MicroData Summary for Paul Toshihiro Sakai
Bishop Paul Toshihiro Sakai (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAshiya, Archdiocese of Osaka
Ordained PriestTorreciudad, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Osaka, Archdiocese of Osaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Osaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 15 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jul 2018

Quantcast