Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kenjiro Koriyama

Bishop Emeritus of Kagoshima, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1942 Born
20 Mar 197229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kagoshima, Japan
3 Dec 200563.2AppointedBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
29 Jan 200663.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
7 Jul 201875.8RetiredBishop of Kagoshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Kenjiro Koriyama
Bishop Paul Kenjiro Koriyama (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kagoshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmamioshima
Ordained BishopJunsin Girls High School, Kagoshima, Diocese of Kagoshima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kagoshima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,048
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast