Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wayne Francis Berndt, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Naha, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1954 Born
16 Aug 197622.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Jun 198026.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 May 198329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Dec 201763.5AppointedBishop of Naha, Japan
12 Feb 201863.7Ordained BishopBishop of Naha, Japan

MicroData Summary for Wayne Francis Berndt
Bishop Wayne Francis Berndt O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Naha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFitchburg, Diocese of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
Ordained PriestYonkers, NY
Ordained BishopOur Lady, Consolation of the Sick, Church, Naha, Diocese of Naha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Naha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2017
  • mn/ob: CB, 9 Dec 2017
  • c23: CB, 8 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 12 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,676

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast