Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pyay

Dioecesis Pyayensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alexander Pyone Cho, Bishop
  • Joseph Devellerez Thaung Shwe, Bishop Emeritus
  • Gregory Taik Maung, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 8 October 1991
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Yangon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 80,906 (31,249 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Meegyaungyeh, Pyay, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (053)21.100

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Akyab
9 July 1940ErectedDiocese of Chittagong Prefecture Apostolic of Akyab (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Prome
19 September 1957Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Akyab Prefecture Apostolic of Prome
Diocese of Prome
21 February 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Prome Diocese of Prome
Diocese of Pyay
8 October 1991Name ChangedDiocese of Prome Diocese of Pyay

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Akyab
19503,3191,200,828.3%131325566ap1951
Prefecture Apostolic of Prome
Diocese of Prome
19708,9901,750,000.5%1899988144ap1971
198012,3733,200,000.4%881,54634513ap1981
199017,5005,930,000.3%17171,02945920ap1991
Diocese of Pyay
199922,2008,378,700.3%22221,00926220ap2000
200022,9008,500,000.3%262688026920ap2001
200123,3008,700,000.3%262689627220ap2002
200223,7188,755,000.3%252594827220ap2003
200324,0008,880,000.3%252596027420ap2004
200424,3009,028,000.3%252597227420ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011