Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Maryanayagam Swamidoss Pillat, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vellore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1905BornVallambury
7 Jul 193429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jul 195651.5AppointedBishop of Vellore, India
9 Sep 195651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vellore, India
17 Jul 196964.5DiedBishop of Vellore, India

MicroData Summary for David Maryanayagam Swamidoss Pillat:
Bishop David Maryanayagam Swamidoss Pillat S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Vellore

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013