Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Mendonça

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1892Born
8 Dec 192735.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 193846.1AppointedBishop of Trichinopoly, India
25 Jul 193846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trichinopoly, India
23 Nov 197078.8RetiredBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
14 Apr 197886.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for James Mendonça
Bishop James Mendonça (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuchur

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast