Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siluvaimathu Teresanathan Amalnather

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tuticorin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1925BornNagapattinam
24 Aug 195125.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 198055.0AppointedBishop of Tuticorin, India
4 Feb 198155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tuticorin, India
8 Dec 199974.1ResignedBishop of Tuticorin, India
12 Feb 201084.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tuticorin, India

MicroData Summary for Siluvaimathu Teresanathan Amalnather:
Bishop Siluvaimathu Teresanathan Amalnather (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuticorin

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Jul 2014