Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Leaden, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Theudalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1913Born
23 Nov 194128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 May 197561.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 May 197561.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Theudalis
8 Aug 197562.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theudalis
10 Apr 199278.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
14 Jul 2014100.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Leaden
Bishop Guillermo Leaden S.D.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 14 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,835
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast