Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Charpin de Genetines

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1660BornSaint-Romain d`Urfé
3 Apr 170646.0SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
13 Sep 170646.4ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
2 Jan 170746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
6 Feb 173069.8ResignedBishop of Limoges, France
21 Jun 173979.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Charpin de Genetines:
Bishop Antoine de Charpin de Genetines (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015