Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo Cesare Bergamin, S.X. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Padang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1910Born
11 Apr 193625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
16 Oct 196150.8AppointedBishop of Padang, Indonesia
6 Jan 196251.1Ordained BishopBishop of Padang, Indonesia
17 Mar 198372.3ResignedBishop of Padang, Indonesia
14 Jan 199180.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Padang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Cesare Bergamin
Bishop Raimundo Cesare Bergamin S.X. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Padang

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiazzola sul Brenta

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast