Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Everard Jean Avertanus Albers, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1904BornNijmegen
14 Jun 193026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
28 Jan 193531.0AppointedPrefect of Malang, Indonesia
15 Mar 193935.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
15 Mar 193935.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malang, Indonesia
10 Aug 193935.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
3 Jan 196156.9AppointedBishop of Malang, Indonesia
1 Mar 197369.1ResignedBishop of Malang, Indonesia
22 Oct 198076.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Malang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Antoine Everard Jean Avertanus Albers:
Bishop Antoine Everard Jean Avertanus Albers O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malang

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013