Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Sigmund von Pfalz-Neuburg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1663BornNeuburg/Donau
10 Feb 168117.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 Jul 168118.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
26 Jul 168926.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 169026.9SucceededBishop of Augsburg, Germany
31 May 169027.1ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
14 Jan 169127.7Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Jan 173773.7DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alexander Sigmund von Pfalz-Neuburg:
Bishop Alexander Sigmund von Pfalz-Neuburg (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015