Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Henri van den Hurk, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1907Born
17 Jul 193225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Jan 195547.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Medan, Indonesia
1 Jan 195547.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
14 Apr 195548.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
3 Jan 196153.7AppointedArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
24 May 197669.1ResignedArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
15 Aug 198982.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Antoine Henri van den Hurk
Archbishop Antoine Henri van den Hurk O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeesch, Netherlands

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast