Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Wilhelmus Manek, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Endeh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1913BornLahurus
28 Jan 194127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Mar 195137.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Larantuka, Indonesia
8 Mar 195137.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
25 Apr 195137.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
3 Jan 196147.4AppointedArchbishop of Endeh, Indonesia
19 Dec 196855.3ResignedArchbishop of Endeh, Indonesia
19 Dec 196855.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bavagaliana
15 May 197662.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Bavagaliana
30 Nov 198976.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Endeh, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Wilhelmus Manek:
Archbishop Gabriel Wilhelmus Manek S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Endeh

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013