Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Thomas Verhoeks, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Surabaia

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1893BornVelddriel, Netherlands
27 Apr 191926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Oct 193744.6AppointedPrefect of Surabaia, Indonesia
16 Oct 194148.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina
16 Oct 194148.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Surabaia, Indonesia
8 May 194249.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina
8 May 195259.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Surabaia, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Michel Thomas Verhoeks:
Bishop Michel Thomas Verhoeks C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Surabaia

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013