Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Jacobus van Vree

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1807BornRhenoy
4 Mar 185346.1AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
15 May 185346.3Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
31 Jan 186154.0DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Jacobus van Vree:
Bishop Franciscus Jacobus van Vree (died ) Bishop of Haarlem

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015