Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter Jan Willekens, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Djakarta

Titular Bishop of Zorava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1881BornReusel, Netherlands
24 Aug 191533.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Jul 193452.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
23 Jul 193452.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zorava
3 Oct 193452.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zorava
1952²70.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Djakarta, Indonesia
27 Jan 197189.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Djakarta, Indonesia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pieter Jan Willekens:
Bishop Pieter Jan Willekens S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Djakarta

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013