Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Montiano Lim

Deceased

Bishop of Boac, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1931Born
17 Mar 195625.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 197139.9AppointedBishop of Laoag, Philippines
27 Apr 197140.2Ordained BishopBishop of Laoag, Philippines
26 Jan 197846.9AppointedBishop of Boac, Philippines
10 May 197847.2InstalledBishop of Boac, Philippines
10 Sep 199867.5DiedBishop of Boac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Rafael Montiano Lim
Bishop Rafael Montiano Lim (born , died ) Bishop of Boac

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoac

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • i: CB, 10 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 872

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast