Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander MacDonell

Deceased

Bishop of Kingston, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1762BornGlen Urquhart, Inchlaggan, Great Britain
16 Feb 178724.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 181956.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Canada, Ontario
12 Jan 181956.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
31 Dec 182058.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
27 Jan 182663.5AppointedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
11 Jan 184077.5DiedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexander MacDonell:
Bishop Alexander MacDonell (born , died ) Bishop of Kingston

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 320, and Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013