Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Carlos de Ancud

Dioecesis Sancti Caroli Anduciae



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1 July 1840
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Puerto Montt
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 24,483 (9,456 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.obispadodeancud.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 407, Blanco Encalada 793, Ancud, Chile
  • Telephone: (065)62.23.25
  • Fax: 62.28.31

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 July 1840ErectedDiocese of Concepción Diocese of San Carlos de Ancud (erected)
14 June 1910Territory LostDiocese of San Carlos de Ancud Mission "Sui Iuris" of Valdivia (erected)
1 April 1939Territory LostDiocese of San Carlos de Ancud Diocese of Puerto Montt (erected)
17 February 1940Territory LostDiocese of San Carlos de Ancud Prefecture Apostolic of Aysén (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195099,430101,40098.1%256313,20762922ap1951
1965100,000120,00083.3%244283,57143422ap1967
1970100,000110,72890.3%235283,57153222ap1971
1976100,000111,00090.1%285333,030264024ap1977
1980113,000121,00093.4%244284,035353424ap1981
1990122,000132,00092.4%162186,777343524ap1991
1999122,000156,00078.2%2110313,9355124124ap2000
2000118,100151,52077.9%166225,368583725ap2001
2001118,000151,60077.8%176235,1305103925ap2002
2002117,978151,51677.9%216274,369383725ap2003
2003116,800151,51677.1%216274,325373325ap2004
2004116,625151,62076.9%225274,319163626ap2005
2010139,000171,00081.3%237304,633592726ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013