Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Thomas Walsh

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Altiburus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1942 Born
27 May 196725.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
28 Jun 200462.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
28 Jun 200462.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Altiburus
21 Sep 200462.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altiburus
5 Sep 201775.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Thomas Walsh
Bishop Gerald Thomas Walsh (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,690
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Sep 2017