Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Joseph Sullivan

Bishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1945 Born
29 May 197126.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
28 Jun 200459.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
28 Jun 200459.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Enera
21 Sep 200459.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Enera
8 Jan 201367.8AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
12 Feb 201367.9InstalledBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Dennis Joseph Sullivan
Bishop Dennis Joseph Sullivan (born ) Bishop of Camden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York City, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York City, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Camden.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,691
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast