Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Basoli

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1895BornOzieri
15 Aug 191822.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 193640.9AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
27 Dec 193641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
4 Jul 197074.6DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Basoli:
Bishop Lorenzo Basoli (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013