Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Schrembs

Deceased

Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1866Born
29 Jun 188923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
13 Jan 191144.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
13 Jan 191144.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
22 Feb 191144.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sophene
11 Aug 191145.4AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
16 Jun 192155.2AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
25 Mar 193973.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
2 Nov 194579.6DiedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Schrembs
Archbishop Joseph Schrembs (born , died ) Bishop of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWutzelhofen, Germany

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast