Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Augustine McFadden

Deceased

Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1880BornCleveland
17 Jun 190524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 May 193251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 May 193251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
8 Sep 193251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
2 Jun 194362.4AppointedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
16 Nov 195271.8DiedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for James Augustine McFadden:
Bishop James Augustine McFadden (born , died ) Bishop of Youngstown

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015