Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Roland Huot, S.S.S. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1910Born
8 Sep 193221.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
25 Mar 193928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
1961²50.0AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
1969²58.0CeasedSuperior General of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
16 Jun 200695.5DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roland Huot
Father Roland Huot S.S.S. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUSA

  • a priest for 67.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast