Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael James Gallagher

Deceased

Bishop of Detroit, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1866BornAuburn, MI
19 Mar 189326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
5 Jul 191548.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
5 Jul 191548.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
8 Sep 191548.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
26 Dec 191650.1SucceededBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
18 Jul 191851.7AppointedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
18 Nov 191852.0InstalledBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
20 Jan 193770.2DiedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael James Gallagher:
Bishop Michael James Gallagher (born , died ) Bishop of Detroit

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014