Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Hierl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Teuchira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1856BornParsberg
4 Jul 188024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
4 Feb 191155.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
4 Feb 191155.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Teuchira
18 Apr 191155.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teuchira
31 Aug 193680.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Hierl:
Bishop Johann Baptist Hierl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013