Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbero Joseph (Michael) Fleischer, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mariannhill

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1874BornDettelbach, Germany
30 Jul 189925.6Ordained PriestPriest
190834.0IncardinatedPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
192046.0AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
22 Mar 192248.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mariannhill, South Africa
22 Mar 192248.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
15 Aug 192248.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
192652.0ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
14 Apr 195076.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mariannhill, South Africa
19 Mar 196389.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mariannhill, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Adalbero Joseph (Michael) Fleischer:
Bishop Adalbero Joseph (Michael) Fleischer C.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mariannhill

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013