Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Zimmermann

Auxiliary Bishop of Essen

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1948 BornGelsenkirchen
30 May 198032.0Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
14 Mar 201465.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
14 Mar 201465.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
29 Jun 201466.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Zimmermann:
Bishop Wilhelm Zimmermann (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Essen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Essen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2014
  • ob/c1: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014